NY S00300 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes certain technical amendments to the estates, powers and trusts law and the surrogate's court procedure act to reflect the provisions of the marriage equality act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes certain technical amendments to the estates, powers and trusts law and the surrogate's court procedure act to reflect the provisions of the marriage equality act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-03-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-07Assemblyordered to third reading cal.88
2019-03-07Assemblysubstituted for a5604
2019-02-05Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2019-02-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-02-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-02-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-01-29Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-01-28Senate1ST REPORT CAL.58
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A05604 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - substituted by s300

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback