NY S00297 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires transmitters of money to provide a warning which informs consumers of certain fraudulent activities that may occur.
Title
Requires transmitters of money to provide a warning which informs consumers of certain fraudulent activities that may occur.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.175 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2019-05-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.717 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A09728 (Same As) 2020-02-06 - referred to banks