NY S00295 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows municipalities to lease naming rights of government-owned property.
Title
Allows municipalities to lease naming rights of government-owned property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2015-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.128 |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02032 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to local governments