NY S00291 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the time between appointing an acting department head and the governor submitting a name for new department head to one hundred eighty days or two hundred seventy days when the senate is adjourned.
Title
Limits the time between appointing an acting department head and the governor submitting a name for new department head to one hundred eighty days or two hundred seventy days when the senate is adjourned.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-07 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-01-11 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |