NY S00290 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - APPROVAL MEMO.24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - APPROVAL MEMO.24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts a debtor's interest in his or her rent-stabilized lease from bankruptcy proceedings.
Title
Exempts a debtor's interest in his or her rent-stabilized lease from bankruptcy proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.24 |
2021-10-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.489 |
2021-10-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.137 |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | substituted for a113 |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.204 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00113 (Same As) 2021-03-10 - substituted by s290