NY S00287 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the court from granting custody of or unsupervised visitation with a child to a person who has been convicted or accused of raping the parent of the child.
Title
Prohibits the court from granting custody of or unsupervised visitation with a child to a person who has been convicted or accused of raping the parent of the child.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Robach [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Sen. Elaine Phillips [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2018-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.123 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2017-03-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.184 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |