NY S00271 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the small farm disaster recovery grant program; provides grants for the purchase and replanting of crops destroyed by natural disaster.
Title
Establishes the small farm disaster recovery grant program; provides grants for the purchase and replanting of crops destroyed by natural disaster.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.97 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A01337 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to agriculture