NY S00270 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2316B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2316B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires facilities to perform pulse oximetry screening on newborns.
Title
Requires facilities to perform pulse oximetry screening on newborns.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2316B |
2013-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1216 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 270B |
2013-05-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2013-05-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-04-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 270A |
2013-04-25 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02316 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - signed chap.184