NY S00257 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing registration records of victims of sexual violence to be kept confidential in certain cases.
Title
Relates to authorizing registration records of victims of sexual violence to be kept confidential in certain cases.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.373 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2019-05-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.613 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07617 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to election law