NY S00249 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the undertaking required during the pendency of a stay of enforcement of a judgment against a participating or non-participating manufacturer under the master settlement agreement.
Title
Relates to the undertaking required during the pendency of a stay of enforcement of a judgment against a participating or non-participating manufacturer under the master settlement agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2015-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.109 |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01813 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to judiciary