NY S00244 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - SIGNED CHAP.393
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - SIGNED CHAP.393
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to human trafficking awareness and training; requires employees of lodging facilities to have training in the recognition of a human trafficking victim; requires the division of criminal justice services, the office of temporary and disability assistance and the New York state interagency task force on human trafficking to approve a human trafficking recognition training program.
Title
Relates to human trafficking awareness and training; requires employees of lodging facilities to have training in the recognition of a human trafficking victim; requires the division of criminal justice services, the office of temporary and disability assistance and the New York state interagency task force on human trafficking to approve a human trafficking recognition training program.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-20 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.393 |
2022-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.174 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | substituted for a887c |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2022-05-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-16 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2022-05-10 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 244B |
2022-05-10 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-10 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2022-02-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-02-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.129 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2021-05-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | AMENDED 244A |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.485 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00887 (Same As) 2022-05-17 - substituted by s244b