NY S00237 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases maximum income eligibility levels for real property tax exemptions for seniors.
Title
Increases maximum income eligibility levels for real property tax exemptions for seniors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.375 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A07544 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to aging