NY S00228 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - PRINT NUMBER 228A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a veterans intership program (V.I.P. NY); awards ten percent of available interships in the assembly youth participation program and the senate student program to eligible honorably discharged veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a veterans intership program (V.I.P. NY); awards ten percent of available interships in the assembly youth participation program and the senate student program to eligible honorably discharged veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-24SenatePRINT NUMBER 228A
2021-11-24SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2021-01-19SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06445 (Same As) 2021-11-29 - print number 6445a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback