NY S00227 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes intentional damage to an authorized emergency vehicle a crime of criminal mischief in the third degree.
Title
Makes intentional damage to an authorized emergency vehicle a crime of criminal mischief in the third degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.463 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-01-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-01-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-01-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.64 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09771 (Same As) 2018-02-06 - referred to codes