NY S00223 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of elections to provide Russian interpreters at certain polling locations in cities having a population in excess of one million people.
Title
Requires the board of elections to provide Russian interpreters at certain polling locations in cities having a population in excess of one million people.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.452 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1082 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03904 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in election law