NY S00222 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reporting of youth placed in foster care settings and recruitment of foster parents; requires information including the total number of youth placed in foster care, the reasons why such youth were placed and the efforts the state has taken to recruit and retain foster parents.
Title
Relates to reporting of youth placed in foster care settings and recruitment of foster parents; requires information including the total number of youth placed in foster care, the reasons why such youth were placed and the efforts the state has taken to recruit and retain foster parents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | approval memo.31 |
2020-12-15 | Senate | signed chap.321 |
2020-12-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.870 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S222C |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.221 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | rules report cal.221 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-13 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-03-06 | Senate | print number 1436c |
2020-03-06 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to children and families |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to children and families |
2019-05-10 | Senate | print number 1436b |
2019-05-10 | Senate | amend and recommit to children and families |
2019-04-03 | Senate | print number 1436a |
2019-04-03 | Senate | amend and recommit to children and families |
2019-01-15 | Senate | referred to children and families |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1436C |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.870 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 222C |
2020-03-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2019-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.992 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 222B |
2019-05-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-03-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 222A |
2019-03-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A01436 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - approval memo.31