NY S00215 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that subpoenas issued relating to election matters be served with a separate informational sheet that summarizes why the subpoena has been issued.
Title
Requires that subpoenas issued relating to election matters be served with a separate informational sheet that summarizes why the subpoena has been issued.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2022-05-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.807 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07834 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to election law