NY S00211 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.413
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to voter notification of special elections; provides such notice be posted on the board of elections website not less than two weeks prior to such election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to voter notification of special elections; provides such notice be posted on the board of elections website not less than two weeks prior to such election.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-25AssemblySIGNED CHAP.413
2019-10-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading cal.377
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a837a
2019-06-06Assemblyreferred to election law
2019-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-03SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 211C
2019-05-29SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 211B
2019-05-20SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 211A
2019-04-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-09Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-08Senate1ST REPORT CAL.370
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A00837 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s211c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00211&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00211&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00211
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00211&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00211A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00211&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00211B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00211&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00211C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S211#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S211#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00211&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback