NY S00205 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of parks, recreation and historic preservation to cooperate with municipalities in establishing adopt-a-park programs; municipalities may enter into agreements with volunteer groups for provision of services.
Title
Directs the commissioner of parks, recreation and historic preservation to cooperate with municipalities in establishing adopt-a-park programs; municipalities may enter into agreements with volunteer groups for provision of services.
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Marisol Alcantara [D] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. James Tedisco [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.445 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1089 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06675 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development