NY S00202 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5321
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5321
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the term "reportable business relationship" as it relates to certain employees of the state university of New York and the city university of New York.
Title
Relates to the term "reportable business relationship" as it relates to certain employees of the state university of New York and the city university of New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5321 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1350 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.394 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05321 (Same As) 2022-11-23 - tabled