NY S00193 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of corrections and community supervision to maintain the responsibility and costs of monitoring any person released on parole with the mandatory requirement of installation of an ignition interlock device on their motor vehicle.
Title
Requires the department of corrections and community supervision to maintain the responsibility and costs of monitoring any person released on parole with the mandatory requirement of installation of an ignition interlock device on their motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1781 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A02915 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to correction