NY S00191 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 13 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-10-13 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes credit unions to participate in the excelsior linked deposit program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes credit unions to participate in the excelsior linked deposit program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2021-06-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-06-03Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-03Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.326
2021-06-03Assemblysubstituted for a5459
2021-06-01Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2021-06-01SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-04-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-04-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-04-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.714
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A05459 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - substituted by s191

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback