NY S00191 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - PRINT NUMBER 191A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the phase-out on varying time schedules of state use of various categories of pesticides on state property; provides that it does not apply to certain antimicrobial pesticides; requires the department of environmental conservation to adopt a pest management plan for every state department, agency, and public benefit corporation; provides for waivers and exemptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the phase-out on varying time schedules of state use of various categories of pesticides on state property; provides that it does not apply to certain antimicrobial pesticides; requires the department of environmental conservation to adopt a pest management plan for every state department, agency, and public benefit corporation; provides for waivers and exemptions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-28SenatePRINT NUMBER 191A
2014-03-28SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2014-01-08SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2013-01-09SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A09890 (Same As) 2014-05-27 - referred to environmental conservation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback