NY S00188 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - PRINT NUMBER 188A
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - PRINT NUMBER 188A
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing translators at certain polling place locations if fifteen percent of the number of voting age citizens who speak the same language other than English at home reside in the district where such polling place is located.
Title
Relates to providing translators at certain polling place locations if fifteen percent of the number of voting age citizens who speak the same language other than English at home reside in the district where such polling place is located.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 188A |
2022-04-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04180 (Same As) 2022-04-26 - print number 4180a