NY S00186 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Kirby and Quigley's Law"; expands the definition of aggravated cruelty to animals to include harm to a companion animal during the commission of a felony.
Title
Enacts "Kirby and Quigley's Law"; expands the definition of aggravated cruelty to animals to include harm to a companion animal during the commission of a felony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.323 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.889 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A01834 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to agriculture