NY S00165 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the removal of judges who are convicted of certain misdemeanor crimes and/or parole violations and requires certain hearings to be public.
Title
Authorizes the removal of judges who are convicted of certain misdemeanor crimes and/or parole violations and requires certain hearings to be public.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 165A |
2019-02-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05299 (Same As) 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in judiciary