NY S00136 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases compensation of election inspectors to $300 and coordinators to $350 in New York city.
Title
Increases compensation of election inspectors to $300 and coordinators to $350 in New York city.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-09 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-09 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-09 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-09 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-01-10 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2023-01-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-01-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2 |
2023-01-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02565 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to election law