NY S00136 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to strengthening of utility storm response and compliance.
Title
Relates to strengthening of utility storm response and compliance.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] |
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-10 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 136B |
2021-02-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.245 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 136A |
2021-01-28 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |