NY S00121 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A472C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A472C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of education to conduct a survey regarding instruction on the Holocaust within the state; provides a report shall be delivered which includes detailed results of the survey, the extent the survey data submitted was compliant with section eight hundred one of the education law, and if needed, recommendations to strengthen provisions of law if not compliant.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of education to conduct a survey regarding instruction on the Holocaust within the state; provides a report shall be delivered which includes detailed results of the survey, the extent the survey data submitted was compliant with section eight hundred one of the education law, and if needed, recommendations to strengthen provisions of law if not compliant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A472C |
2022-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1417 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 121B |
2022-05-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-04-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2021-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 121A |
2021-05-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00472 (Same As) 2022-08-10 - signed chap.490