NY S00106 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health clubs accept cancellation of a membership within twenty-four hours of receiving notice of the cancellation.
Title
Requires health clubs accept cancellation of a membership within twenty-four hours of receiving notice of the cancellation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-04-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 106A |
2021-04-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A02285 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - enacting clause stricken