NY S00102 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Sunrise Day Camps Association, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the Sunrise Day Camps Association, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20Assemblyreferred to real property taxation
2019-03-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-05Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-04Senate1ST REPORT CAL.201
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A04859 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - referred to real property taxation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback