NY S00101 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "New York land-home property act"; relates to manufactured homes certificate of title and the conveyance and encumbrance of manufactured homes as real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "New York land-home property act"; relates to manufactured homes certificate of title and the conveyance and encumbrance of manufactured homes as real property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-18Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2024-03-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-03-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-02-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-01-31Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-01-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.309
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-05-08Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2023-05-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-08SenateREPASSED SENATE
2023-05-01SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 101A
2023-05-01SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-01Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-05-01SenateRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2023-01-18Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2023-01-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-01-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-01-17SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.70
2023-01-17SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-01-04SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A01703 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to judiciary

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback