NY S00098 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - PRINT NUMBER 98B
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - PRINT NUMBER 98B
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting the acceptance of high volume hydraulic fracturing wastewater from oil or natural gas extraction activities at wastewater treatment facilities and solid waste management facilities.
Title
Relates to prohibiting the acceptance of high volume hydraulic fracturing wastewater from oil or natural gas extraction activities at wastewater treatment facilities and solid waste management facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 98B |
2018-06-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 98A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00302 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - ordered to third reading rules cal.270