NY S00093 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits persons from holding civil office when convicted of certain felonies.
Title
Prohibits persons from holding civil office when convicted of certain felonies.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.673 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1057 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 93A |
2021-04-19 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01945 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to governmental operations