NY S00092 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the one-year time requirement for aggregation payments.
Title
Eliminates the one-year time requirement for aggregation payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.148 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-13 | Senate | AMENDED 92A |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.397 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08337 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means