NY S00085 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender long-term care facility residents' bill of rights.
Title
Establishes the lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender long-term care facility residents' bill of rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1328 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07807 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to aging