NY S00076 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain notice requirements; prohibits landlords from including incorrect information relating to rent decontrol in certain leases and renewals thereof pertaining to units subject to the Affordable New York Housing Program.
Title
Relates to certain notice requirements; prohibits landlords from including incorrect information relating to rent decontrol in certain leases and renewals thereof pertaining to units subject to the Affordable New York Housing Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.98 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.202 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00641 (Same As) 2022-04-12 - print number 641a