NY S00075 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires vision screening examinations for students using examination devices and testing methods, including, but not limited to, the Snellen Eye Test Chart and automated vision screening devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires vision screening examinations for students using examination devices and testing methods, including, but not limited to, the Snellen Eye Test Chart and automated vision screening devices.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2024-05-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1278
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2023-06-10SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2023-03-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-03-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-03-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.532
2023-01-04SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A07162 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback