NY S00063 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revives civil actions for certain sex offenses committed against a person less than eighteen years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revives civil actions for certain sex offenses committed against a person less than eighteen years of age.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-04SenateNOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
2016-01-06SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2015-06-15SenatePRINT NUMBER 63A
2015-06-15SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2015-04-22SenateNOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
2015-01-07SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A02872 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to codes

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback