NY S00062 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-16 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-16 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the reporting of lyme and tick-borne disease infection after death.
Title
Relates to the reporting of lyme and tick-borne disease infection after death.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | referred to health |
2024-05-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.988 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1043 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02286 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to health