NY S00044 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - PRINT NUMBER 44B
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Imposes an additional tax surcharge on certain non-primary residence class one and class two properties in a city with a population of one million or more.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Imposes an additional tax surcharge on certain non-primary residence class one and class two properties in a city with a population of one million or more.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-11SenatePRINT NUMBER 44B
2020-09-11SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES
2020-08-05SenatePRINT NUMBER 44A
2020-08-05SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO CITIES
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO CITIES

Same As/Similar To

A04540 (Same As) 2020-08-17 - print number 4540a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback