NY S00029 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - PRINT NUMBER 29A
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - PRINT NUMBER 29A
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Sets forth the business income base rate for taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2022.
Title
Sets forth the business income base rate for taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 29A |
2022-04-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A05064 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means