NY S00023 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the villages of Malone, Saranac Lake and Tupper Lake, in the county of Franklin, to employ retired former members of the division of state police as part-time village police officers.
Title
Authorizes the villages of Malone, Saranac Lake and Tupper Lake, in the county of Franklin, to employ retired former members of the division of state police as part-time village police officers.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2024-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.658 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2023-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-31 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1310 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02455 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental employees