NY S00017 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 13 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-10-13 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes employees to petition an employer to apply to participate in a shared work program for purposes of avoiding a reduction in workforce or for purposes of re-hiring.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes employees to petition an employer to apply to participate in a shared work program for purposes of avoiding a reduction in workforce or for purposes of re-hiring.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2021-06-07Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.473
2021-06-07Assemblysubstituted for a7373
2021-03-01Assemblyreferred to labor
2021-03-01SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-03-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-02-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-02-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-02-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.360
2021-02-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 17A
2021-02-04SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A07373 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s17a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback