NY S00013 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Scott J. Beigel unfinished receiver act"; relates to unfinished frames or receivers; establishes the crimes of criminal sale of an unfinished frame or receiver in the first and second degrees as class D and E felonies, respectively.
Title
Enacts the "Scott J. Beigel unfinished receiver act"; relates to unfinished frames or receivers; establishes the crimes of criminal sale of an unfinished frame or receiver in the first and second degrees as class D and E felonies, respectively.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.27 |
2021-10-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.519 |
2021-10-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.423 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a2666a |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 13A |
2021-05-24 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-02-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.311 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02666 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s13a