NY S00012 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to making false statements to district attorneys, assistant district attorneys or district attorney investigators.
Title
Relates to making false statements to district attorneys, assistant district attorneys or district attorney investigators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-03-19 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-04-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-03-13 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |