NY K00376 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - adopted

Summary

Memorializing Governor Andrew M. Cuomo to proclaim May 13, 2019, as Blue Star Families' Day in the State of New York

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Memorializing Governor Andrew M. Cuomo to proclaim May 13, 2019, as Blue Star Families' Day in the State of New York

Sponsors

Asm. John McDonald [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Jacob Ashby [R]
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. William Barclay [R]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]
Asm. Kenneth Blankenbush [R]Asm. Karl Brabenec [R]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D]Asm. Kevin Byrne [R]Asm. Marjorie Byrnes [R]Asm. William Colton [D]
Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Clifford Crouch [R]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]
Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]Asm. Gary Finch [R]Asm. Michael Fitzpatrick [R]
Asm. Christopher Friend [R]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Joseph Giglio [R]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. Stephen Hawley [R]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Mark Johns [R]
Asm. D. Billy Jones [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Brian Kolb [R]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]
Asm. Peter Lawrence [R]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Brian Manktelow [R]Asm. David McDonough [R]
Asm. John Mikulin [R]Asm. Brian Miller [R]Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Melissa Miller [R]
Asm. Michael Montesano [R]Asm. Angelo Morinello [R]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Michael Norris [R]
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Philip Palmesano [R]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Edward Ra [R]
Asm. Andrew Raia [R]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Michael Reilly [R]Asm. Jamie Romeo [D]
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Robin Schimminger [D]
Asm. Colin Schmitt [R]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Doug Smith [R]
Asm. Robert Smullen [R]Asm. Daniel Stec [R]Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Christopher Tague [R]
Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Mark Walczyk [R]Asm. Mary Walsh [R]Asm. Helene Weinstein [D]
Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13Assemblyadopted
2019-05-10Assemblyreferred to calendar

Same As/Similar To

J01377 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - ADOPTED

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback