NY A11726 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - substituted by s8380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - substituted by s8380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The Wage Theft Prevention Act (WTPA) seeks to expand the rights of employees to seek civil and criminal avenues of remedy for their employers failing to follow labor law appro- priately and the specifications therein.
Title
Establishes the wage theft prevention act providing for certain notifications to employees in their primary languages and protections for employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-30 | substituted by s8380 | |
2010-11-29 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-11-29 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-11-24 | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S08380 (Same As) 2010-12-10 - SIGNED CHAP.564