NY A11555 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - signed chap.453
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - signed chap.453
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of an independent worker for purposes of the health insurance demonstration program for independent workers.
Title
Relates to the definition of an independent worker for purposes of the health insurance demonstration program for independent workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-30 | signed chap.453 | |
2010-08-18 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-30 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-30 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-30 | 3RD READING CAL.1401 | |
2010-06-30 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8358A | |
2010-06-29 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-29 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-29 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-29 | ordered to third reading rules cal.467 | |
2010-06-29 | rules report cal.467 | |
2010-06-29 | reported | |
2010-06-25 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-06-24 | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S08358 (Same As) 2010-06-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11555