NY A11443 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-29 - substituted by s8129b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-29 - substituted by s8129b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
This bill seeks to place a suspension of any permitting for hydraulic fracturing in low-permeability natural gas reservoirs such as the Marcellus Shale and Utica Shale formations to ensure adequate review and analysis of the effects of this type of drilling on water quality, air, environmental, safety and public health.
Title
Suspends hydraulic fracturing for the extraction of natural gas or oil until May 15, 2011; suspends the issuance of new permits for such drilling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-29 | substituted by s8129b | |
2010-07-01 | ordered to third reading rules cal.579 | |
2010-07-01 | rules report cal.579 | |
2010-07-01 | reported | |
2010-07-01 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-07-01 | reference changed to ways and means | |
2010-06-23 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-06-21 | print number 11443b | |
2010-06-21 | amend and recommit to environmental conservation | |
2010-06-17 | print number 11443a | |
2010-06-17 | amend and recommit to environmental conservation | |
2010-06-14 | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08129 (Same As) 2010-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.6837